House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Referred to committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes, by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |