House
|
03/21/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 164
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-21-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:11 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Donovan added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|