House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
08/25/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Riemer
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|