House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |