House
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 230
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Maxey
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 10, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goyke
|
|
|
House
|
08/08/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Maxey
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|