House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Representatives Stubbs and Gustafson added as coauthors | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |