House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 08/22/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |