House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Representatives Wichgers and Nedweski added as coauthors | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |