House
|
09/14/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Published 6-21-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 6-20-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 12
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 6-15-2023 by directive of the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-15-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 29, Noes 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Taken off the Assembly message, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1b)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 concurred in as amended, Ayes 68, Noes 26, Paired 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 34
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Neubauer, Snodgrass, Clancy, Vining, Bare, Moore Omokunde, Madison, Jacobson, Considine, Ratcliff, C. Anderson, Andraca, Joers, Haywood, Sinicki, Billings, J. Anderson, Ortiz-Velez, Baldeh, Ohnstad, Shelton, Drake, Palmeri, Conley, Cabrera, Hong, Emerson and Stubbs
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 21, Noes 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 4 to Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 4 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Taylor, Larson, Hesselbein, Roys and Smith
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Spreitzer, Agard, Carpenter, Hesselbein, L. Johnson, Larson, Pfaff, Roys, Smith, Taylor and Wirch
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Spreitzer, Agard, Carpenter, Hesselbein, L. Johnson, Larson, Roys, Pfaff, Smith, Taylor and Wirch
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Made a special order of business at 12:01 p.m. on 6-14-2023 by the committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 4, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Report concurrence, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s. 16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Printed engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk-3255
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 56, Noes 36, Paired 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kurtz
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 34
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Neubauer, Haywood, Billings, C. Anderson, Andraca, Baldeh, Drake, Goyke, Joers, Palmeri and Stubbs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 34
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Neubauer, Haywood, Subeck, Billings, C. Anderson, Andraca, Baldeh, Bare, Clancy, Conley, Considine, Doyle, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Hong, Joers, Madison, McGuire, Moore Omokunde, Ohnstad, Ortiz-Velez, Ratcliff, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Stubbs, Vining and Cabrera
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Refused to refer to committee on Local Government, Ayes 34, Noes 57
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred to calendar of 5-17-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Retirement Systems received
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Retirement Systems
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Executive action taken by committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Baldeh, Conley, C. Anderson and Ratcliff
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions pursuant to s. 13.52, Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Referred to joint survey committee on Retirement Systems pursuant to s. 13.50, Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|