House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/29/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced |