House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:12 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced |