Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 99, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dallman | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced |