House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wichgers | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Representative Bodden added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/25/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced |