House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced |