House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 07/13/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced |