House
|
06/23/2023
|
Published 6-23-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 6-22-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 16
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 6-16-2023 by directive of the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-16-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2)
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senators Taylor and Spreitzer added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 10, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Bare, Haywood, Emerson, Ortiz-Velez and Clancy
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|