House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Introduced |