House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Ohnstad, Conley, Baldeh and Riemer | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield | ||
House | 08/30/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 08/22/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/17/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 08/03/2023 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Summerfield | ||
House | 08/03/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield | ||
House | 07/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Introduced |