House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 08/15/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Introduced |