House
|
04/06/2023
|
Published 4-7-2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-3-2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senator Wirch added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representatives Pronschinske and Andraca added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Senator Quinn added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|