House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Representatives Moore Omokunde and Drake added as coauthors | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Representative Conley added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/25/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/21/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/15/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Introduced |