House
|
03/21/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 149
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 23, Noes 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Point of order that Senate Amendment 2 was not germane well taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Decision of the Chair stands as the judgment of the Senate, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Point of order that Senate Amendment 1 was not germane well taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Roys, Agard, Hesselbein, Smith, Larson, L. Johnson, Spreitzer, Pfaff, Wirch and Carpenter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Wirch, Agard, Hesselbein, L. Johnson, Larson, Pfaff, Smith and Spreitzer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 86, Noes 12
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 8, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions pursuant to s. 13.52, Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Representative Summerfield added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Maxey added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|