Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:14 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Duchow | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Introduced |