House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representatives Emerson, C. Anderson and Gustafson added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 07/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Introduced |