House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dallman | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 09/20/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/15/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/09/2023 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Introduced |