House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Introduced |