House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Senator L. Johnson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Introduced |