Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Representative Macco added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|