Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 90, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 65, Noes 30
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives C. Anderson, Vining, Considine, Hong, Ratcliff, Madison, Clancy, Emerson, J. Anderson, Jacobson and Moore Omokunde
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Vos
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Representatives O'Connor and Emerson added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sinicki
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Representative Nedweski added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|