House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Shankland and Billings
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Shankland and Billings
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:13 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Mursau and Swearingen
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Mursau and Swearingen
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Mursau and Swearingen
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|