House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/21/2023 | Representative Conley added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Introduced |