House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Introduced |