Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 4 | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Introduced |