House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/21/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Snyder | ||
House | 07/21/2023 | Senator Felzkowski added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 06/30/2023 | Introduced |