House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/09/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros | ||
House | 08/18/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/09/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/07/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/26/2023 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 06/30/2023 | Introduced |