House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Shelton, Sinicki and Cabrera | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 6 | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/30/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 06/30/2023 | Introduced |