House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/21/2023 | Representative Schutt added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/21/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Representative Rozar added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Representative Goeben added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Introduced |