House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Introduced |