House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:16 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Introduced |