Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB356 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: January 12, 2024 	Contact: Ethan Lauer, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Assembly Bill 356 Assembly Amendments 1 and 2 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 356 
2023 Assembly Bill 356 requires the Department of Military Affairs (DMA) to administer a grant 
program for incumbent local exchange carriers for the reimbursement of costs associated with the 
following: 
 The IP-based transport of Next Generation 911. 
 The database used to operate Next Generation 911. 
 The purchase, installation, and maintenance of Next Generation 911 equipment. 
The bill appropriates $8 million in each of fiscal years 2023-24 and 2024-25 from the Police and Fire 
Protection Fund.
1
 
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 
Assembly Amendment 1 reduces to $0 the appropriation in fiscal year 2023-24, reduces to $6 million 
the appropriation in fiscal year 2024-25, and provides that no moneys may be encumbered under the 
appropriation after June 30, 2027. 
Assembly Amendment 1 also requires DMA to report the following information to the Legislature by 
January 1, 2027: 
 A summary of the status of the emergency services IP network. 
 A summary of the total amount of grants issued for the three types of reimbursement listed above. 
 A projection of additional necessary costs for the reimbursement of incumbent local exchange 
carriers’ costs in the future. 
 A recommendation regarding whether the grant program should continue to operate after June 30, 
2027. 
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 2 
Effective July 1, 2024, Assembly Amendment 2 updates the name of the Police and Fire Protection 
Fund to the 911 Fund in the appropriation created in the bill, to coincide with the date that 2023 
Wisconsin Act 19 re-names the fund. 
                                                
1
 2023 Wisconsin Act 19 re-names the Police and Fire Protection Fund as the 911 Fund, effective July 1, 2024.  - 2 - 
BILL HISTORY 
Representative Kurtz offered Assembly Amendment 1 on December 27, 2023. On January 10, 2024, the 
Assembly Committee on State Affairs recommended adoption of Assembly Amendment 1 on a vote of 
Ayes, 9; Noes, 2; and passage of the bill, as amended, on a vote of Ayes, 11; Noes, 0. The bill was then 
referred to the Joint Committee on Finance (JCF). 
Representative Kurtz offered Assembly Amendment 2 on January 10, 2024. On January 11, 2024, the 
JCF recommended adoption of Assembly Amendments 1 and 2, each on a vote of Ayes, 13; Noes, 0; and 
passage of the bill, as amended, on a vote of Ayes, 12; Noes, 1.  
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
EL:ksm