Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB356 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
ACT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Prepared by: Ethan Lauer, Senior Staff Attorney 	April 5, 2024 
2023 Wisconsin Act 222 
[2023 Assembly Bill 356] 
Next Generation 911  
Grant Program 
BACKGROUND 
2017 Wisconsin Act 59 required the Department of Military Affairs (DMA) to invite bids and contract 
for the creation, operation, and maintenance of a statewide emergency services IP network to provide 
all public safety answering points
1
 with the network necessary to implement Next Generation 911. Act 
59 also established a 911 subcommittee to, among other responsibilities, advise DMA regarding Next 
Generation 911. 
2023 WISCONSIN ACT 222 
2023 Wisconsin Act 222 establishes a Next Generation 911 grant program. Under the program, DMA 
awards grants to incumbent local exchange carriers to reimburse them for costs associated with the 
following: 
 The IP-based transport of Next Generation 911. 
 The database used to operate Next Generation 911. 
 The purchase, installation, and maintenance of Next Generation 911 equipment. 
DMA must develop grant eligibility criteria and may seek recommendations from the 911 
subcommittee. DMA may not award more than one grant to an incumbent local exchange carrier in a 
fiscal year. 
Act 222 creates a biennial appropriation account from the Police and Fire Protection Fund
2
 for the 
grant program. It appropriates $6 million in fiscal year 2024-25, but provides that none of the 
appropriated moneys may be encumbered after June 30, 2027. 
Act 222 requires DMA to report the following information to the Legislature by January 1, 2027: 
 A summary of the status of the statewide emergency services IP network that 2017 Wisconsin Act 59 
required DMA to create, operate, and maintain. 
 A summary of the total amount of grants issued for the three types of reimbursement available 
under the Next Generation 911 program. 
 A projection of additional necessary costs for the reimbursement of incumbent local exchange 
carriers’ costs in the future. 
                                                
1
 A “public safety answer point” is a facility to which a 911 call is initially routed for response. 
2
 2023 Wisconsin Act 19 renames the Police and Fire Protection Fund as the 911 Fund, effective July 1, 2024. Act 222 
updates references to that fund within the Next Generation 911 grant program effective on that date.  - 2 - 
 A recommendation regarding whether the Next Generation 911 grant program should continue to 
operate after June 30, 2027. 
Effective date: March 29, 2024 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
EL:jal