House
|
04/10/2024
|
Senator Hesselbein added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 58
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 11-8-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Senator Agard added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Representative Rozar added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|