House
|
10/26/2023
|
Published 10-26-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 10-25-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 35
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 10-23-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
08/25/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nedweski
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|