Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 63, Noes 34 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative O'Connor | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 07/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities | ||
House | 07/27/2023 | Introduced |