House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:15 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 7, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
08/15/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|