House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:16 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 09/21/2023 | Representative Hurd added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/20/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Representative Drake added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Representative Macco added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/05/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stubbs | ||
House | 08/04/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 08/04/2023 | Introduced |