Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 63, Noes 35 | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Referred to calendar of 10-12-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Representative Michalski added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Introduced |