House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 3 | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives C. Anderson, Baldeh, Conley and Ratcliff | ||
House | 09/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Introduced |