Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representatives Joers and Maxey added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Representative Drake added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
08/24/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|