House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 08/11/2023 | Introduced |